Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF JOHN AND JOSEPH CARD

Charity number: 203827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 18 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 09 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 09 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 February 2020 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 04 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required