Accounts and annual returns BAKER AND TUCKER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (OTHERWISE BOURTON ALMSHOUSES)

Charity number: 203879
Charity reporting is overdue by 299 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 299 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 299 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required