EMBERTON UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 204221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £42.05k £40.51k £33.57k £46.46k £45.98k
Total expenditure £34.47k £35.24k £30.48k £11.93k £24.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k