JANE EADITH CATHERINE CAULFEILD BEQUEST

Charity number: 204295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £822 £1.92k £1.71k £560 £575
Total expenditure £736 £415 £390 £550 £450
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A