CHARITY OF WILLIAM SEARLE

Charity number: 204508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW MACCREADIE Trustee 02 March 2012 None on record
Emma Shaughnessy-Philp Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
Eliot Green Trustee 25 November 2013
TREVILSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Victoria Thorpe Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Kathryn Rees Trustee 29 February 2012 None on record
Rosalyn Symonds Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
DAVID LAUD Trustee 30 November 2011 None on record