Accounts and annual returns RAMSEY WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 204548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window