Financial history RAMSEY WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 204548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £247.12k £112.73k £243.16k £208.05k £249.92k
Total expenditure £224.93k £108.49k £233.26k £186.54k £221.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A