ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CHELTENHAM AND EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 205097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £184.05k £71.42k £63.69k £80.12k £93.35k
Total expenditure £52.65k £81.69k £45.70k £51.38k £60.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A