ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CAMBRIDGE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £250.85k £230.32k £422.15k £264.23k £285.01k
Total expenditure £258.76k £222.42k £237.97k £263.57k £255.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A