SONNING AND DISTRICT WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 205224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Firmager Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Jacqueline JEFFERY Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
PAULINE ALLEN Trustee None on record
John Eastwell Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
DARREN SMITH Trustee 27 June 2014 None on record
SUSAN BRADLEY Trustee 21 March 2012 None on record
JUDY BALDWIN Trustee None on record
Rev JAMIE TAYLOR Chair
BULL INN ECCLESIASTICAL TRUST Received: On time
Jane Diwell Trustee
THE LIBERTY OF EYE AND DUNDSEN POOR'S LAND CHARITY Received: On time
LUKE HENDERSON Trustee 10 January 2016
SONNING C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION Overdue by 85 days
SONNING C OF E OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB Received: On time
PENNY FEATHERS Trustee None on record
DAVID WOODWARD Trustee
EYE AND DUNSDEN VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
BRIAN BROOKER Trustee None on record