ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CAMBRIDGESHIRE MID-EAST

Charity number: 205294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £236.29k £264.55k £243.04k £271.56k £255.01k
Total expenditure £209.85k £225.76k £252.72k £246.27k £262.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.20k £0 N/A N/A