ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CAMBRIDGESHIRE MID-EAST

Charity number: 205294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA KATHLEEN EDWARDS Trustee None on record
VAL FOUNTAIN Trustee 11 July 2016 None on record
MR F G HAMMETT Chair 23 June 2015 None on record
HAYLEY Brooks Trustee 08 August 2016 None on record
Elizabeth Fairclough Trustee 15 July 2019 None on record
EILEEN LOWE Trustee None on record
YVONNE COLLINS Trustee 28 October 2011 None on record