Financial history THE SILVERSMITHS AND JEWELLERS CHARITY

Charity number: 205785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £170.21k £162.77k £172.95k £170.09k £105.86k
Total expenditure £169.41k £209.14k £232.82k £262.90k £236.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A