Financial history ONSLOW ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 205893
Charity reporting is overdue by 247 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.56k £7.64k £9.14k £9.28k £9.25k
Total expenditure £5.18k £7.57k £5.20k £12.61k £4.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A