THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND

Charity number: 205975
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £52.00k £52.93k £54.47k £60.82k £57.89k
Total expenditure £43.30k £45.21k £49.34k £54.66k £50.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A