THE HENRY AND ELIZABETH LINEHAM FUND

Charity number: 205975
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL FREDERICK WILKINSON Trustee 01 February 2016
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
JOHN NIGHTINGALE Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
SALLY BEARDSWORTH Trustee 18 May 2018
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
KINGSTHORPE MANOR AND TOWN CHARITY Received: On time
THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST Received: On time
KERR HOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE(NORTHAMPTON AND COUNTY) Received: On time
DANIELLE STONE MA Trustee 18 May 2018
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
NORTHAMPTON TOWN OF SANCTUARY Recently registered
ANDREW STUART SIMPSON Trustee 13 December 2011 None on record
MRS JENNY CONROY Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
THE CAMROSE COMMUNITY TOY LIBRARY Received: On time
CLLR ANNA SARAH KING Trustee 01 February 2016
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
WENDY ANN HOWES Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
ULRIC EGERTON GRAVESANDE Trustee
NORTHAMPTON AFRO-CARIBBEAN ORGANISATION Overdue by 1038 days
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
FRANCES HELEN WIRE Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
JANET EVELINE MARCH Trustee 13 December 2011 None on record
PHILIP LESLIE AGER Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
JEAN BULTEEL Trustee
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
JAMIE LANE Trustee 18 May 2018
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
Terence Whenham Trustee 28 February 2014
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late
TIMOTHY JOHN HADLAND Chair None on record
Anthony Perry Trustee 09 December 2019
SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY Received: 2 days late