AUGUSTA NONA HUNT FOR ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 206075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £52.37k £61.89k £58.44k £54.14k £58.77k
Total expenditure £29.40k £86.74k £44.85k £31.39k £30.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A