AUGUSTA NONA HUNT FOR ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 206075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP EDWARD ANDERSON Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS Received: 9 days late
Graham Douglas Millar Trustee 17 October 2020 None on record
LOUISE CASE Trustee 13 November 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE UNITED BENEFICE OF GODSTONE AND BLINDLEY HEATH Overdue by 35 days
ST NICHOLAS YOUTH CENTRE Received: On time
ROBERT JOHN CLARKE Trustee 23 February 2018 None on record
Nicholas Charles Francis Barker Trustee 12 February 2018
FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS Received: 9 days late
Rev PETER O'CONNELL Chair 17 November 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE UNITED BENEFICE OF GODSTONE AND BLINDLEY HEATH Overdue by 35 days
KAANA Overdue by 158 days
Joanna Lindsey Gregory Trustee 10 February 2018 None on record