WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF UPHOLDERS, PETER JACKSON CHARITY

Charity number: 206283
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required