WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF UPHOLDERS, PETER JACKSON CHARITY

Charity number: 206283
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.50k £7.90k £9.53k £8.78k £8.47k
Total expenditure £7.20k £9.75k £10.93k £6.35k £6.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A