ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH

Charity number: 206296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £218.97k £236.28k £312.85k £304.72k £270.67k
Total expenditure £207.18k £207.74k £253.30k £299.16k £280.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £30.00k