Financial history THE ACTORS' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 206524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.62m £2.05m £2.01m £1.45m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.09m £1.10m £1.10m £1.65m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £509.17k £905.00k £828.04k £735.53k £762.61k
Income - Other trading activities £19.23k £17.98k £15.86k £26.42k £20.70k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £85.89k
Income - Investment £1.09m £1.13m £1.16m £682.04k £1.05m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.97k £3.96k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £721.29k £490.80k £520.61k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £972.88k £1.02m £1.03m £1.03m £1.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £65.07k £63.84k £69.11k £72.29k £141.05k
Expenditure - Governance £27.67k £34.12k £23.87k £38.48k £109.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £54.46k £54.37k £57.35k £52.83k £68.29k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0