Financial history JERUSALEM LODGE NO 197 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 206735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.28k £3.92k £3.96k £4.87k £5.17k
Total expenditure £2.30k £2.55k £2.30k £2.30k £2.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A