Accounts and annual returns THE DOCK CHARITABLE FUND, OTHERWISE THE MERSEY DOCKS AND HARBOUR BOARD CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 206913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required