Financial history THE DOCK CHARITABLE FUND, OTHERWISE THE MERSEY DOCKS AND HARBOUR BOARD CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 206913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.32k £35.52k £29.56k £3.10k £5.02k
Total expenditure £37.40k £31.94k £18.90k £15.00k £5.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A