CENTRE FOR POLICY ON AGEING

Charity number: 207163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £493.00k £129.00k £91.63k £111.12k £80.58k
Total expenditure £147.00k £158.00k £172.92k £182.12k £178.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A