CHURCH SCHOOLMASTERS AND SCHOOLMISTRESSES' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 207236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £26.75k £69.59k £74.81k £68.50k £65.26k
Total expenditure £83.96k £107.64k £159.22k £218.89k £170.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A