SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF LONDON

Charity number: 207237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Carver MPhil FSA Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
MR Paul J Dury MRICS IHBC FSA Chair 30 April 2014 None on record
Dr Heather Sebire PhD FSA Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Dr Alan Lloyd Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Vincent Gaffney Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Dr John Maddison Trustee 26 April 2018
THE NORFOLK CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED
Dr Elizabeth Hallam Smith PhD FSA Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Prof Christopher Scull MA, FSA Trustee 07 January 2014 None on record
DERMOT SLOANE BA Trustee 26 April 2018
LONDON AND MIDDLESEX ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
DUNCAN BROWN Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Dr John Cooper DPhil FSA Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Samantha Lucy Trustee 26 June 2019
THE GLADSTONE MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
Stephen Dunmore Trustee 21 April 2016
ROYAL VOLUNTARY SERVICE Received: On time