NORTON FOLGATE ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 207243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £162.01k £166.12k £196.18k £192.11k £158.25k
Total expenditure £63.15k £60.00k £45.74k £69.36k £72.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A