NORTON FOLGATE ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 207243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Goldring Trustee 28 October 2021 None on record
CHRISTOPHER DAVID WEAVERS Chair
QUEEN MARY UNIVERSITY OF LONDON STUDENTS' UNION LIMITED Received: 8 days late
Phillip Gamble Trustee 03 July 2018 None on record
Catherine McCarter Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
Richard Wasserfall Trustee 31 May 2021 None on record
ISABELLE PUCHWEIN Trustee 08 April 2013 None on record
Andrea Bapst Trustee 14 July 2021 None on record
Steve Pavitt Trustee 27 January 2016 None on record