Financial history BRITISH UNION LODGE NO 114 MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 207280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.24k £3.99k £5.05k £4.46k £1.57k
Total expenditure £590 £9.56k £1.83k £8.53k £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A