Financial history DAMERHAM CRICKET GROUND

Charity number: 207382
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £4.08k £5.36k £3.80k £1.45k £3.93k
Total expenditure £5.90k £2.50k £6.54k £7.86k £6.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A