THE SOCIETY FOR RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF MEDICAL MEN

Charity number: 207473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 October 2016 On time Download