THE SOCIETY FOR RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF MEDICAL MEN

Charity number: 207473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £185.48k £221.21k £226.25k £241.90k £268.86k
Total expenditure £124.62k £119.27k £141.35k £150.35k £176.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A