ALPINE GARDEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 207478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Thomas Mountfort Trustee 08 February 2020
THE EGGINTON CHARITES Received: On time
Diane clement Trustee 14 November 2020 None on record
Gail Devries Trustee 16 November 2019
RELATE WORCESTERSHIRE Received: On time
David James Morris Trustee 11 November 2017 None on record
Martin Keith Rogerson Trustee 12 November 2016
KALEIDOSCOPE COMMUNITY MUSIC Received: On time
David Keith Haselgrove Trustee 26 January 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR JOHN GALLOWAY Trustee None on record
paul cook Trustee 14 November 2020 None on record
Jonathan Robert Webster Trustee 17 November 2018 None on record
Celia Sawyer Trustee 16 November 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER PETER BAILES Chair 11 November 2017 None on record