ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 207530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £214.12k £262.60k £232.61k £246.90k £233.19k
Total expenditure £123.16k £288.60k £232.13k £223.12k £220.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A