ST CHRISTOPHER'S FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 207782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mauricette Noella Hacquard Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
MR BERT O'DONOGHUE Chair 16 October 2013 None on record
Akua Doreen Owusu-Akonor Trustee 08 May 2019 None on record
Joe Anichebe BA HONS Trustee 23 January 2019 None on record
SALLY O' NEILL BA HONS Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
Vicki Markiewicz Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Angela Jennifer Anne Dakin Trustee 06 September 2017 None on record
DINESH VISAVADIA BSC Trustee 16 October 2013
THE ST PANCRAS FOUNDATION Overdue by 673 days
Rupert Peter Duff Trustee 03 September 2020 None on record
James John Halliwell Trustee 08 May 2019 None on record
Kelly Veronica Dooley Trustee 08 May 2019 None on record
Dr DAVID JOHN BROWN Trustee 16 October 2013
SOLIHULL CARERS CENTRE Received: On time
DANIEL HOBBS BA HONS Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record