Trustees THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY
Charity number: 207890

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David M Smith BA PhD CChem FRSC | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Mokaya OBE FRSC | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jeremy K M Sanders CBE MA PhD ScD FRSC FRS | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Remya Norris MChem CChem MRSC | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard F W Jackson MA PhD CChem FRSC | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Cooke MRSC | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annette Doherty OBE FRSC | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Muhammed Saiful Islam BSc PhD CChem FRSC | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Duncan Graham BSc PhD CChem FRSC FRSE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gillian Reid BSc PhD FRSC FRSE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Christopher Oxley BSc MBA CChem FRSC CMgr FCMI | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Elizabeth Louise Armstrong-Denby BSc Msc CChem FRSC | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gallery-Strong BSc MSc CSci CChem FRSC | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Annie Powell BSc PhD CChem FRSC | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marina Resmini FRSC | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Elizabeth Rowsell FRSC | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.