Financial history SURREY DISPENSARY

Charity number: 208091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £15.69k £12.43k £16.34k £9.24k £1.79k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £15.52k £34.37k £27.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A