CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 208106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.04k £11.41k £6.72k £5.12k £5.65k
Total expenditure £2.81k £4.53k £12.26k £11.68k £13.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A