Financial history HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY

Charity number: 208443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £4.49m £4.51m £6.39m £3.55m £3.38m
Total expenditure £4.00m £4.10m £4.91m £3.79m £3.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.00k £22.00k £23.00k £56.00k £37.00k
Income - Other trading activities £2.35m £2.21m £2.21m £1.16m £917.00k
Income - Charitable activities £520.00k £298.00k £319.00k £514.00k £309.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £6.00k £0
Income - Investment £1.61m £1.70m £1.81m £1.83m £1.93m
Income - Other £0 £288.00k £2.02m £0 £191.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £23.00k £50.00k £20.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.31m £2.39m £3.07m £2.26m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.69m £1.71m £1.84m £1.52m £1.20m
Expenditure - Governance £61.00k £80.00k £54.00k £780.00k £734.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £647.00k £0 £1.13m £668.00k £418.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £49.00k £47.00k £282.00k £68.00k £73.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0