Trustees HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY
Charity number: 208443

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Roy Cambrian Norman | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Howard James Philip Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Gabb | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frederick Sivyer | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lt. Col. Adam George Edward Bate | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lenore Dudman | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Raymond Smith | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Simon John Rhodes Halliday TD | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Frances Edwards | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Major Mark William Bezerra Speeks | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maj Iain Cardean Spottiswoode Morpeth TD | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maj Christian Oliver Wragg | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM PHILLIP BASING | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Second Lieutenant Timothy James Monger-Godfrey | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sir Patrick Sanders KCB CBE | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major Peter Dirom Courtenay Vyvyan-Robinson | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Special Superintendant Peter Michael Patrick FitzGerald | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Major David Brigden | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Major Hari Voyantzis | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Major James Alexander Robinson | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Capt Thomas Holme Cardwell | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Timothy Lloyd Davies | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
William Hulbert Grove | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Willis | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN HUGO ROLAND JEE | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR GENERAL SIMON FRANCIS NEIL LALOR CB, TD | Trustee | 02 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR JAMES OLIVER LEIGHTON TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR SIMON CHRISTOPHER BRIGGS TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lieutenant Colonel JOHN ROBERT LONGBOTTOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR RP QUAIN TD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWIN ALBERT SEABROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR CHARLES VERRIOUR MARMENT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.