MARJORIE COOTE ANIMAL CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 208493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £149.48k £153.56k £157.82k £165.40k £169.21k
Total expenditure £151.24k £192.97k £155.66k £179.38k £205.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A