MARJORIE COOTE ANIMAL CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 208493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 03 January 2017 On time Download