Accounts and annual returns THE HUMANITARIAN TRUST

Charity number: 208575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 February 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 18 February 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 April 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 April 2020 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window