Financial history THE HUMANITARIAN TRUST

Charity number: 208575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £211.72k £219.79k £225.68k £240.20k £228.89k
Total expenditure £251.10k £183.51k £249.35k £232.96k £302.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A