Financial history STRATFORD AND EAST LONDON MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 208659
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £9.62k £10.25k £10.09k £4.83k £10.35k
Total expenditure £10.32k £10.68k £9.66k £5.80k £9.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A