Trustees THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 208728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr May Chiao Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Richard Thomas Kimblin QC Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Athena Natassa Markides Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Professor James Cuthbert Smith FRS Trustee 15 September 2021
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF LONDON FOR IMPROVING NATURAL KNOWLEDGE (COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE ROYAL SOCIETY)
Received: On time
HEALTH DATA RESEARCH UK
Received: On time
Dr Peter Christopher Higgins Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
Paul Wilson Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
David St John Jones Trustee 18 March 2020
None on record
Kenneth John Sims Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
MARTIN GEORGE EDMUND ROWSON Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
Shruti Ajitsaria Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
RICHARD JAMES SYKES Trustee 11 June 2019
HWHC LIMITED
Received: On time
Alexander Richard Brooks Large Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record