Trustees NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 208734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Liddle Chair 27 October 2016
None on record
Gregory Nicholas Beeton Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Kirstie Marie David Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Glenn Peter Houchell Trustee 14 October 2021
HIGH KELLING VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Jennifer Zeala ffrench-Constant Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Robert Stephen Lucking Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Samuel Gordon Foster Collin Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Professor Ben Garrod Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Professor Andrew Charles Clarke Trustee 18 October 2019
FUCHS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE TRANS-ANTARCTIC ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SCOTT BARRY PINCHING Trustee 18 October 2019
THE SMITH & PINCHING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PINCHING FAMILY TRUST
Received: On time
Stephen Richard Cale Trustee 18 October 2019
None on record
Lyndsay Whiteman Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
JOHN SHARPE Trustee 26 October 2017
None on record
Susan ROE Trustee 21 October 2015
THE NORFOLK GARDENS TRUST
Received: On time
Jeff Price Trustee 24 October 2014
None on record