Accounts and annual returns JOHN SAMUEL NEWLYN

Charity number: 208780
Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 158 days
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 158 days
Annual return 15 March 2022 28 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2021 31 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2019 Not Required